Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Mola, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foggia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sasima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1832Born
20 Dec 185624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
12 Jun 189360.7AppointedBishop of Foggia, Italy
18 Jun 189360.8Ordained BishopBishop of Foggia, Italy
29 Apr 190976.6ResignedBishop of Foggia, Italy
29 Apr 190976.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasima
8 Jan 191481.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Foggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Mola (VIAF: 90337194)
Bishop Carlo Mola C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Foggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017