Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Milito

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1948 BornRossano
12 Aug 197224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
4 Apr 201263.7AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy
13 May 201263.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Milito:
Bishop Francesco Milito (born ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2012
  • ob: CB, 4 Apr 2012
  • c2+: CB, 16 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 10 Feb 2014