Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Masones y Nin

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1649³BornCagliari
1 Oct 170354.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cagliari, Italy
1 Oct 170354.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
15 Dec 170455.6AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
Jan 1724³74.7DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Masones y Nin:
Bishop Isidoro Masones y Nin (born , died Jan 1724) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 143, and Page 401
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015