Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Carnicer (Carnizar), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1643³Born
5 Nov 166017.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Sep 169551.8AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
13 Jul 172076.7DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Carnicer (Carnizar)
Bishop Tommaso Carnicer (Carnizar) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Alghero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 78
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,695, Number 37
  • prof: CB, 18 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast