Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Masi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tempe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1826Born
29 Jan 187852.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tempe
28 Apr 187852.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tempe
11 Apr 190377.2DiedTitular Bishop of Tempe

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Masi
Bishop Giuseppe Masi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tempe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMezzoiuso, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 540
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017