Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eamon Martin

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Apostolic Administrator of Dromore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1961 Born
28 Jun 198725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Derry, Ireland
18 Jan 201351.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland
21 Apr 201351.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland
8 Sep 201452.8SucceededArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
15 Apr 201957.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Dromore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Eamon Martin
Archbishop Eamon Martin (born ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDerry
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, Armagh, Archdiocese of Armagh

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Armagh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 12 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,768
  • s: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2014
  • aadm: CB, 15 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 16 Apr 2019

Quantcast