Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Kevin Daly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Derry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1933BornBallyshannon
16 Mar 195723.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 197440.1AppointedBishop of Derry, Ireland
31 Mar 197440.3Ordained BishopBishop of Derry, Ireland
26 Oct 199359.8ResignedBishop of Derry, Ireland
8 Aug 201682.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Derry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Edward Kevin Daly (VIAF: 51003103)
Bishop Edward Kevin Daly (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Derry

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016