Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Martin Hayes

Bishop-Elect of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1959 Born
4 Apr 198828.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
10 Jun 198929.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
29 Jun 202060.6AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
20 Sep 202060.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Martin Hayes
Father Martin Hayes (born ) Bishop-Elect of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTwo-Miles-Borris, Thurles, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly)
Ordained BishopSts. Patrick and Felim, Cathedral, Caven

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Kilmore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2020
  • od/c01: CB, 29 Jun 2020
  • c2+: CB, 14 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Sep 2020

Quantcast