Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Duffy

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1951 Born
13 Jun 197624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Clogher, Ireland
8 Dec 201867.0AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
10 Feb 201967.2Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Duffy
Bishop Lawrence Duffy (born ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagheracloone, Monaghan, Diocese of Clogher
Ordained PriestSaint Macartan, Cathedral, Monaghan, Diocese of Clogher
Ordained BishopSaint Macartan, Cathedral, Monaghan, Diocese of Clogher

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Clogher.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 8 Dec 2018
  • c2+: CB, 6 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast