Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Mulligan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Clogher


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1912BornDroles Lisbellaw
20 Jun 193725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clogher, Ireland
28 Nov 196957.5AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
18 Jan 197057.6Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
7 Jul 197967.1ResignedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
21 Jan 199178.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Clogher, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Mulligan:
Bishop Patrick Mulligan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Clogher

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013