Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Duffy

Bishop Emeritus of Clogher


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1934 BornDublin
22 Jun 195824.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 197945.4AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
2 Sep 197945.5Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
6 May 201076.2RetiredBishop of Clogher, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Duffy:
Bishop Joseph Duffy (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Clogher

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Clogher.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 May 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015