Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Liam SeŠn MacDaid

Bishop Emeritus of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1945 Born
15 Jun 196923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clogher, Ireland
6 May 201064.7AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
25 Jul 201065.0Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
1 Oct 201671.2ResignedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Liam SeŠn MacDaid
Bishop Liam SeŠn MacDaid (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBundoran, Co. Donegal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Clogher.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,764
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast