Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Charles McQuaid, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dublin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1895BornCootehill
29 Jun 192428.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Nov 194045.3AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
27 Dec 194045.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
29 Dec 197176.4RetiredArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
7 Apr 197377.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Charles McQuaid:
Archbishop John Charles McQuaid C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dublin

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1940, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013