Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Marek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Titular Bishop of Tigillava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1930Born
23 Jun 195727.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Nov 197343.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
1 Nov 197343.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigillava
27 Dec 197343.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigillava
3 Mar 197847.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Marek:
Bishop Józef Marek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015