Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arturo Marchi

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1846BornCopparo
21 Sep 186822.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 190155.6AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
22 Dec 190155.6Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
29 Apr 191063.9AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
4 Feb 192881.7DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arturo Marchi:
Archbishop Arturo Marchi (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 479
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 73
  • c3 title: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015