Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Marchisano

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia del Gonfalone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1929BornRacconigi, Italy
29 Jun 195223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
6 Oct 198859.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Populonia
6 Oct 198859.3AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission of Preserving the Church’s Patrimoney of Art and History
6 Jan 198959.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Populonia
4 Sep 199162.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology
4 May 199363.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church
9 Jul 199465.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Populonia
200272.5AppointedPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
24 Apr 200272.8AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
13 Oct 200374.3ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church
21 Oct 200374.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia del Gonfalone
21 Oct 200374.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Aug 200475.2RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology
28 Aug 200475.2RetiredPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
5 Feb 200575.6AppointedPresident of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See
31 Oct 200677.3RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
3 Jul 200980.0RetiredPresident of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See
12 Jun 201485.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia del Gonfalone
27 Jul 201485.1DiedPresident Emeritus of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Francesco Marchisano:
Francesco Cardinal Marchisano (born , died ) President Emeritus of Labour Office of the Apostolic See

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,023
  • ab: CB, 12 Jun 2014
  • d: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014