Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Mantini

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1881Born
21 Jun 192645.2AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
4 Jul 192645.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
22 Jun 193150.2AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
17 Dec 193150.7InstalledBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
13 Mar 193957.9DiedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Mantini
Bishop Filippo Mantini (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli e Pergola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatelica

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • d: CB, 16 Oct 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018