Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Félix François Malleret, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1865Born
2 Feb 191246.5AppointedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
19 Mar 191246.6Ordained BishopBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
25 Jun 191448.9DiedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles

MicroData Summary for Joseph Félix François Malleret
Bishop Joseph Félix François Malleret C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceServant, France

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018