Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Lucibello

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Amalfi, Italy

Titular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1837Born
9 Jun 190264.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Amalfi, Italy
9 Jun 190264.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
29 Jun 190265.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
25 Nov 191174.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Lucibello
Bishop Michele Lucibello (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmalfi

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 548
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast