Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Virgilio López Irias, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1937Born
15 Aug 196426.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jul 197335.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jul 198749.7AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Honduras
7 Oct 198750.0Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Honduras
22 Jun 200466.7DiedBishop of Trujillo, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Virgilio López Irias
Bishop Virgilio López Irias O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Ceiba

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,417
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018