Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Liu Jinwen (Liu Chin-wen, Liou King wen)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fenyang [Fenyang], China

Titular Bishop of Antipatris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1872Born
18 Jun 190330.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 193057.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fenyang [Fenyang], China
23 Jul 193057.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
12 Oct 193058.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
11 Apr 194673.6AppointedBishop of Fenyang [Fenyang], China
15 Jan 194875.4RetiredBishop of Fenyang [Fenyang], China
15 Jan 194875.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
1956²83.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Fenyang [Fenyang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Liu Jinwen (Liu Chin-wen, Liou King wen)
Bishop Francis Liu Jinwen (Liu Chin-wen, Liou King wen) (born , died 1956) Bishop Emeritus of Fenyang [Fenyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSintchwang
Ordained BishopPeking

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,930, Number 68
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast