Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph L Văn Ấn

Deceased

Bishop of Xun Lộc, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1916Born
19 Mar 194427.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Oct 196549.0AppointedBishop of Xun Lộc, Viet Nam
9 Jan 196649.3Ordained BishopBishop of Xun Lộc, Viet Nam
17 Jun 197457.7DiedBishop of Xun Lộc, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph L Văn Ấn
Bishop Joseph L Văn Ấn (born , died ) Bishop of Xun Lộc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThac-Da

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 1 Apr 2020

Quantcast