Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rocco Leonasi

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1831Born
24 Mar 185524.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 188251.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
30 Mar 188251.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
30 Apr 188251.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
14 Mar 188352.1SucceededBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
30 Apr 189362.2DiedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rocco Leonasi
Bishop Rocco Leonasi (born , died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLauria
Ordained BishopS. Charles au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 83, and Page 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017