Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Antoni Łaszcz

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

Titular Bishop of Antipatris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1704³BornŁaszczow
20 Sep 172723.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 172924.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 173833.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
23 Jun 173833.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
3 Nov 174036.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
7 Aug 174137.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
31 Jan 174843.5DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Antoni Łaszcz:
Bishop Józef Antoni Łaszcz (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

  • a priest for 18.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 88, and Page 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Oct 2013