Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Cruz Laplana y Laguna

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1875Born
24 Sep 189823.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 192146.5AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
26 Mar 192246.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
7 Aug 193661.2DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
28 Oct 2007Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Cruz Laplana y Laguna
Bishop Bl. Cruz Laplana y Laguna (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlan

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1922, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast