Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Jiménez Pérez

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Barbastro

Titular Bishop of Anthedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1863BornSomontín
24 Apr 188622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Almería, Spain
4 Jan 191854.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Barbastro, Spain
4 Jan 191854.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
7 Apr 191854.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
21 Oct 192663.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Barbastro, Spain

MicroData Summary for Emilio Jiménez Pérez:
Bishop Emilio Jiménez Pérez (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Barbastro

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 57, and Page 79
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013