Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Laparelli Pitti

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1823Born
24 Aug 184622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cortona, Italy
23 Feb 187248.3AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
3 Mar 187248.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
22 Jan 189672.2DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Laparelli Pitti (VIAF: 89170013)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Laparelli Pitti (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortona, Diocese of Cortona
Ordained BishopSan Apollinare, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,538
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 227
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,062
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017