Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Théodore Lamarche

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1827Born
20 Dec 185124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
12 Oct 188760.5SelectedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
25 Nov 188760.6ConfirmedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
29 Jan 188860.8Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
15 Jun 189265.2DiedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Théodore Lamarche
Bishop Jacques-Théodore Lamarche (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceQuimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017