Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Kympat

Deceased

Bishop of Jowai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1946BornMawsurong
23 Jan 197730.1Ordained PriestPriest of Shillong, India
28 Jan 200659.1AppointedBishop of Jowai, India
2 Apr 200659.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jowai, India
30 Jul 201164.6DiedBishop of Jowai, India

MicroData Summary for Vincent Kympat:
Bishop Vincent Kympat (born , died ) Bishop of Jowai

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,108
  • d: CB, 30 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013