Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Kuba Thowa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mahagi-Nioka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1917²BornPakenge
15 Aug 194831.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mahagi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Jul 196245.5AppointedBishop of Mahagi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Oct 196245.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mahagi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Oct 197962.8ResignedBishop of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Jan 200083.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Kuba Thowa:
Bishop Thomas Kuba Thowa (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mahagi-Nioka

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 173
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013