Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Izidoro Kosinski, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1932Born
21 Dec 195725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
8 May 198149.1AppointedBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
24 Jul 198149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
7 Jan 200976.7RetiredBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
15 Sep 201785.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Izidoro Kosinski
Bishop Izidoro Kosinski C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Três Lagoas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTomaz Coelho
Death PlaceCuritiba, Archdiocese of Curitiba, Parana

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2009
  • d: CB, 16 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018