Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Kalluvelil

Bishop of Mississauga (Syro-Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1955 Born
18 Dec 198429.0Ordained PriestPriest of Palghat (Syro-Malabar), India
6 Aug 201559.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of Canada (Syro-Malabar)
6 Aug 201559.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabalta
19 Sep 201559.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabalta
22 Dec 201863.1AppointedBishop of Mississauga (Syro-Malabar)

MicroData Summary for Jose Kalluvelil
Bishop Jose Kalluvelil (born ) Bishop of Mississauga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThottuva
Ordained BishopVirgin Mary and Saint Athanasius, Canadian Coptic Centre, Church, Mississauga, Apostolic Exarchate of Canada (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Mississauga (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2015
  • ob: CB, 10 Aug 2015
  • c2: CB, 9 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,578

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 15 Mar 2019

Quantcast