Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Janocha

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Barica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1959 Born
28 May 198727.5Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
9 May 201555.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
9 May 201555.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Barica
14 Jun 201555.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barica

MicroData Summary for Michal Janocha (VIAF: 56850290)
Bishop Michal Janocha (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarszawa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 May 2015
  • ob: CB, 9 May 2015
  • c2: CB, 11 May 2015
  • c34: CB, 30 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,509

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast