Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick Charles Hopkins, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of British Honduras, Belize

Titular Bishop of Athribis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1844BornBirmingham, Great Britain
23 Sep 187733.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
17 Aug 189955.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Honduras, Belize
17 Aug 189955.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Athribis
5 Nov 189955.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athribis
10 Apr 192379.0DiedVicar Apostolic of British Honduras, Belize

MicroData Summary for Frederick Charles Hopkins:
Bishop Frederick Charles Hopkins S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of British Honduras

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 129
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013