Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Ramón Herboso y Figueroa, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1710¹BornLima, Peru
6 Apr 176151.2AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
29 Aug 176252.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
16 Sep 177666.7AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
29 Apr 178272.3DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ramón Herboso y Figueroa:
Archbishop Francisco Ramón Herboso y Figueroa O.P. (born 1710, died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 187, and Page 341
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015