Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aurélio Granada Escudeiro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1920BornAlcains
17 Jan 194322.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 197453.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Angra, Portugal
18 Mar 197453.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
26 May 197454.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
30 Jun 197959.1AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
9 Apr 199675.9RetiredBishop of Angra, Portugal
25 Aug 201292.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Aurélio Granada Escudeiro:
Bishop Aurélio Granada Escudeiro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angra

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013