Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Gladès Berzi

Deceased

Bishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1867Born
6 Mar 189629.1AppointedBishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt
29 Mar 189629.2Ordained BishopBishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt
29 Jan 192558.0DiedBishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Gladès Berzi
Bishop Ignazio Gladès Berzi (born , died ) Bishop of Luqsor {Tebe}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGhirghe
Ordained BishopCoptic, Church, Cairo

  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 546
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017