Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pancrazio Giorgi

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1846Born
27 Mar 186922.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 189851.7AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
20 Mar 189851.8Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
30 Mar 191568.8DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pancrazio Giorgi
Bishop Pancrazio Giorgi (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFilettino, Diocese of Anagni
Ordained BishopVilla Lante, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 519
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,404
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jun 2017