Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Gillet

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Albano

Titular Bishop of Germa in Galatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1929 BornRoma
19 Sep 195324.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 199364.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy
7 Dec 199364.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
6 Jan 199464.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
22 Feb 200575.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Gillet:
Bishop Paolo Gillet (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Albano

Please contact the Bishop through the Suburbicarian See of Albano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,196
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013