Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Gigante

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lecce, Italy

Titular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1843Born
23 Dec 187128.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 189854.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lecce, Italy
5 Feb 189854.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
20 Feb 189854.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
15 Oct 190865.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gigante
Bishop Giovanni Gigante (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 307
  • ob/c2: AT, 31 May 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,468
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,898, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast