Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Gianfelice

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1841Born
10 Jun 186524.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189755.8AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
25 Apr 189755.9Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
10 Jun 191675.0DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Gianfelice
Bishop Felice Gianfelice (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittaducale, Diocese of L’Aquila
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 151
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 88
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017