Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie Gentet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Ha´ti

Titular Bishop of Proconnesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1848Born
29 Jun 187627.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 189546.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Ha´ti
10 Dec 189546.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
15 Dec 189546.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
6 Mar 189647.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Ha´ti

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Gentet
Bishop Pierre-Marie Gentet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Marne, France
Ordained BishopPort-au-Prince, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince

  • a priest for 19.6 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 470
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1895, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018