Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Maria Gelmini

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1807BornOssago
18 Sep 183022.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187163.9AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
26 Nov 187163.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
25 Jan 188880.1DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria Gelmini:
Bishop Domenico Maria Gelmini (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013