Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dionisio Guillermo García Ibáñez

Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1945 BornGuantánamo
8 Jul 198540.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
9 Dec 199550.9AppointedBishop of Santisimo Salvador de Bayamo y Manzanillo, Cuba
27 Jan 199651.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santisimo Salvador de Bayamo y Manzanillo, Cuba
10 Feb 200762.0AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
24 Feb 200762.1InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Guillermo García Ibáñez:
Archbishop Dionisio Guillermo García Ibáñez (born ) Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Cuba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,705
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013