Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Ferdinand (Johann Franz) Fritz, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1772³BornHildesheim
178916.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Sep 179422.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Apr 179624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
180330.8IncardinatedPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
10 Mar 183663.9SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
11 Jul 183664.3ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
11 Sep 183664.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
6 Sep 184068.4DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Ferdinand (Johann Franz) Fritz:
Bishop Franz Ferdinand (Johann Franz) Fritz O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013