Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Séamus Freeman, S.A.C.

Bishop Emeritus of Ossory


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1944 BornMullinahone, Tipperary
196520.8ProfessedMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
12 Jun 197127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
14 Sep 200763.5AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
2 Dec 200763.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
29 Jul 201672.4ResignedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Séamus Freeman
Bishop Séamus Freeman S.A.C. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ossory

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ossory.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,570
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Jul 2016