Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião Assis de Figueiredo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1949BornCoxilha Rica
18 Dec 197627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Aug 200152.3AppointedBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
15 Nov 200152.5Ordained BishopBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
2 Dec 200152.5InstalledBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
20 Dec 200758.6DiedBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Assis de Figueiredo:
Bishop Sebastião Assis de Figueiredo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Guiratinga

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,075
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jun 2014