Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Festa

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1864BornAvellino, Italy
9 Jun 190238.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Squillace, Italy
9 Jun 190238.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Capitolias
11 Jun 190238.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capitolias
2 Feb 191854.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tharona
20 Jan 192359.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
18 Apr 1930³66.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Festa:
Archbishop Giovanni Festa (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicaea

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,415
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 179
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013