Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Demetrio Fernández González

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1950 BornPuente del Arzobispo
22 Dec 197424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
9 Dec 200454.8AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
9 Jan 200554.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
18 Feb 201060.0AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Demetrio Fernández González:
Bishop Demetrio Fernández González (born ) Bishop of Córdoba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Córdoba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,806
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013