Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Daniel Falla Robles

Deceased

Bishop of Soacha, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1956Born
28 Nov 199236.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
15 Apr 200952.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
15 Apr 200952.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
20 Jun 200952.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
29 Jun 201659.7AppointedBishop of Soacha, Colombia
15 Aug 201659.8InstalledBishop of Soacha, Colombia
1 May 202164.5DiedBishop of Soacha, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Daniel Falla Robles
Bishop José Daniel Falla Robles (born , died ) Bishop of Soacha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Death PlaceBogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,192
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2016
  • i: CB, 1 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast